judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2317
A-2317
07/05/1949
Application for Writ of Error
ALBERT OTHEN
ESTELLA ROSIER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/25/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/20/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/07/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/02/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/05/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/25/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/11/1950Opinion issued
12/20/1949Brief on the Merits
12/07/1949Brief on the Merits
11/02/1949Brief on the Merits
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Albert OthenPetitioner
Hubert W. GreenAmicus Curiae
Estella Rosier, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information