judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00800-CR
14-89-00800-CR
08/25/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Robinson, Clifford Charles aka King, Tony Mark
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1991Case stored
02/01/1991Mandate Issued
02/01/1991Mandate Issued
01/17/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
09/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/24/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/07/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
03/21/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/21/1990Case ready to be set
03/21/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Ext.time file suppl.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/08/1990Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
03/05/1990Ext.time file supple.brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP
03/05/1990Supplement brief RECEIVED-ANT,APE
02/21/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/21/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/21/1989Transcript FILED
09/07/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Date of Sentence
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJohn L. Denninger
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable PUTNAM REITER
530365
Life & $10,000 (2 counts)