Case Information: 36324 | |||
Short Caption: | CICHOWLAS VS. ROWE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35137 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9702317 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/26/2000 / Cobb, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/22/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brooke & Shaw, LLP--check no. 16902. | ||
06/22/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10660 | |
06/26/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William G. Cobb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/29/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 3, 2000. | 00-15202 | |
09/27/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 12, 2001. | 00-17100 | |
01/17/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 28, 2001. | 01-01013 | |
01/18/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-01106 | |
01/18/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
02/01/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-02164 | |
02/06/2001 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. | 01-02373 | |
03/07/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-04284 | |
03/22/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK | 01-05039 | |
03/22/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |