judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DERRICK M. LOO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0170)
Case Number:S-08-0170Case Docketed On:08/08/2008
Linked To: S-08-0136
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DERRICK M. LOO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DERRICK M. LOO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDerrick M. LooDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 61
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/08/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/15/2008Order - Consolidating cases, and granting in part, motion to modify record on appealOrderConsolidating casesFinal
09/24/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dion Custis for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Public Defender and Dion James Custis for appellants; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/01/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/19/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal