judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICOLAS GONZALEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1346
Short Caption:NICOLAS GONZALEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead: 10-CM-1341 Consolidated: 10-CM-1342 , 10-CM-1343 , 10-CM-1344 , 10-CM-1345 , 10-CM-1346, 10-CM-1359 , 10-CM-1360
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14409-10Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNicolas Gonzalez Y
Mark L. GoldstoneNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/29/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mark L. Goldstone, Esquire
11/09/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CM-1341, 10-CM-1342, 10-CM-1343, 10-CM-1344, 10-CM-145, 10-CM-1346, 10-CM-1359 and 10-CM-1360 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Mark L. Goldstone, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellants in these appeals nunc pro tunc to October 29, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellants shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
12/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (For all consolidated cases) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (181pgs/Tape) 10/1/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1345)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1345)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1341)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1341)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1360)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1360)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1346)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1346)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1343)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1343)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1342)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1342)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1359)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1359)
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CM-1344)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CM-1344)
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/23/2011APPELLANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 22, 2011 (no oppo)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 22, 2011 (no oppo)
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
05/25/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
05/25/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
05/27/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
06/27/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/29/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/19/2011FiledAffirmed
10/11/2011FiledMandate