judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8984
C-8984
08/25/1989
WRIT ERROR - CAUSE
MAXUS EXPLORATION COMPANY f/k/a DIAMOND SHAMROCK EXPLORATION
MORAN BROS. INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/29/1991Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed
07/09/1991Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedRule 4, envelope attached to original motion
09/27/1990Letter brief Respondentreply to amicus.
09/07/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)of NL Industries, Inc., and reply to amicus curiae brief of texaco.
07/27/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF WALBROOK INSURANCE CO. BY TOM LORANCE, 303 JACKSON HILL, SUITE 300, HOUSTON, 77007, 713/868-5560
06/15/1990Reply BriefPetitionerPET'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S SUPP BR AND REPLY BRIEF.
05/29/1990Reply BriefRespondentRESPONDENT'S REPLY TO PET'S SUPP BR.
05/15/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF TEXACO, INC. BY JOE G. ROADY, 3700 FIRST CITY TOWER, HOUSTON, TX. 77002 713/658-8881
05/14/1990Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/08/1990Brief receivedAmicus Curiae (EMPLOYERS) SUPP. TO AMICUS BR.,JOHN FAZIO, BURFORD & RYBURN, 3131 LINCOLN PL., DALLAS, TX 75201 (214) 740-3119
05/07/1990Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/14/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/11/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondent
09/25/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF EMPLOYERS CASUALTY CO. BURFORD & RYBURN-ATTY JAMES H. HOLMES, III, 3131 LINCOLN PLAZA, DALLAS TX
09/14/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/02/1991Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
10/02/1991Mandate issued817 SW2d 50
09/11/1991Corrected opinionMINOR CORRECTIONS TO OP. OF 6/19/91 by J. Hecht (JUDGMENT SAME)
09/11/1991Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledW/OPINION W/MINOR CORRECTIONS. JUDGMENT REMAINS THE SAME.
07/29/1991Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
07/09/1991Motion for RehearingRule 4, envelope attached to original motion
07/09/1991Motion for Rehearing forwarded
07/08/1991Notice requesting filing feemo/re - $10.00
06/28/1991Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordCA affirmed.
06/19/1991Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/19/1991Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedby Justice Hecht 817 SW2d 50
09/27/1990Letter brief reply to amicus.
09/26/1990No description needed.on behalf of Texaco Inc. by attorney Joe G. Roady, 3700 First City Tower, Houston, Texas 77002 (713) 658-8881
09/07/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedof NL Industries, Inc., and reply to amicus curiae brief of texaco.
07/27/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF WALBROOK INSURANCE CO. BY TOM LORANCE, 303 JACKSON HILL, SUITE 300, HOUSTON, 77007, 713/868-5560
06/15/1990Reply BriefPET'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S SUPP BR AND REPLY BRIEF.
05/29/1990Reply BriefRESPONDENT'S REPLY TO PET'S SUPP BR.
05/16/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
05/16/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
05/16/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY MR. HARLOW SPROUSE /FOR RESP BY MR. MICHAEL V. POWELL
05/15/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF TEXACO, INC. BY JOE G. ROADY, 3700 FIRST CITY TOWER, HOUSTON, TX. 77002 713/658-8881
05/14/1990Supplemental Brief filed
05/08/1990Brief received(EMPLOYERS) SUPP. TO AMICUS BR.,JOHN FAZIO, BURFORD & RYBURN, 3131 LINCOLN PL., DALLAS, TX 75201 (214) 740-3119
05/07/1990Supplemental Brief filed
04/30/1990Cost letter issuedGRANT FEE FOR REHEARING
04/25/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
04/25/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
04/25/1990App Writ Err reinstated to docket for reconsiderationCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/25/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/25/1990Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20-5 MINUTES.
04/25/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedPOINTS 4 AND 5.
04/25/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling grantedPET'S MO/RE
04/25/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnORDER OF 11/29/89 DENY.APP WITHDRAWN
04/25/1990Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
12/21/1989Motion for Rehearing forwardedBOXED RECORD IN CLERK'S OFFICE
12/14/1989Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
12/14/1989Motion for Rehearing
11/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
11/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied(THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN 4/25/90)
10/11/1989Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief
09/25/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF EMPLOYERS CASUALTY CO. BURFORD & RYBURN-ATTY JAMES H. HOLMES, III, 3131 LINCOLN PLAZA, DALLAS TX
09/14/1989Brief filed that is difficult to read due to color
09/14/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/14/1989Reply to Response
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/02/1991Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00644-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
773 SW2d 358, 05-08-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
134th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B. Burnett
85-8718-G