judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8994
C-8994
08/25/1989
App Writ of Error
CLEM CECIL MARTIN
GULF INSURANCE GROUP
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/17/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
06/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied(ORDER OF 5/9/90 GR APP WAS TODAY WD AS BEING IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED.)
06/06/1990Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.
05/30/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY GARY JOHNSON/ FOR RESP BY ROBERT D. ALLEN
05/09/1990Amount of time allotted for oral argument.15/15-5 MINUTES.
05/09/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGRANTED ON PTS. 1 AND 2.(THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN AS IMPROVIDENT GRANT ON 6/6/90 AND APP DENIED.)
05/09/1990Order of the Court IssuedTO 5TH CA TO PUBLISH THEIR OPINION OF 5/31/89, CASE NO. 05-88-00826-CV.
05/09/1990Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
09/14/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/13/1989Reply to Response
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/17/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00826-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 05-31-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable SPENCER CARVER
Trial Court Information
199th District Court
Collin
Honorable John R. Roach
86-435-199