judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00867-CR
01-89-00867-CR
08/25/1989
Felony DWI
Capstick, Michael Dennis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/12/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
07/12/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
06/07/1990Motion to dismiss appeal
05/10/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/26/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/26/1990Statement of facts filed
04/26/1990Supplemental transcript filed
03/01/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
11/27/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/19/1989Transcript filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/23/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. Timonty L. Jackson
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 3
Harris
8916147
$500 fine, 45 days,2 crdt