judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00210-CR
12-89-00210-CR
08/25/1989
Other Felony
Brantley, Richard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/1990
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/30/1990
11/15/1990
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
03/14/1990
03/09/1990Brief Filed
03/09/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
02/13/1990Brief Filed
02/13/1990Brief Received
02/07/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/28/1989No Description Available.
11/17/1989Letter from the Court
11/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/13/1989
09/12/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/12/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1990RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
12/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon Michael Sandlin
Brantley, RichardCriminal - AppellantHon. Michael L. Spruiell
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
7-89-59
20 Yrs. TDC