judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8998
C-8998
08/25/1989
App Writ of Error
VICTOR M. JONES and NETTIE JONES
THE SAVINGS & LOAN ASSOCIATION OF BOWIE TEXAS AND ITS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/29/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
01/28/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksCOPIES OF APPELLANT'S MO TO AMEND
01/03/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAS AMENDED
01/03/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing granted
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989Miscellaneous MotionMOTION TO AMEND APPLICATION, 10 MORE COPIES ON THE WAY
09/07/1989No description available.
09/07/1989Reply to Response
08/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/29/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01003-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 05-30-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable ED KINKEADE
Trial Court Information
191st District Court
Dallas
Honorable David K. Brooks
84-8945-J