judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00243-CV
11-89-00243-CV
08/25/1989
Oil & Gas
Sansom, Lucy
Nova Exploration, Inc. and Larry Waldrip
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1990Mandate issued
09/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/12/1990Submission set in Eastland
10/19/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Brief filed
09/26/1989Brief filed
08/30/1989Filing fee paid
08/25/1989Filing fee not paid - possible dismissal
08/25/1989TR filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sansom, LucyAppellantNelson Quinn
Nova & WaldripAppelleeStephen Autry
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Honorable Donald Lane, Judge
169