judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01006-CV
05-89-01006-CV
08/25/1989
Contract
Green Oaks Retail Joint Venture, et al
Southern Savings Loan Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/26/2000Record RetentionDestroy
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
04/11/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/30/1990Response to Motion
03/20/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/05/1990Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/05/1990Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/28/1990Letter Filed
02/23/1990Response to Motion
01/29/1990Letter Sent by the Court
11/03/1989Brief Filed
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/25/1989Brief Filed
08/30/1989MattConv
08/25/1989Transcript Filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/15/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill L Hartman
88-7501-K