judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00298-CV
08-89-00298-CV
08/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Wells Fargo Armored Service Corporation
Mundy, David
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/02/1991Fee paid
04/01/1991Fee paid
02/27/1990Shuck purged
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
02/27/1990Mandate Issued
12/27/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
12/27/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
12/27/1989Submission
12/27/1989Submitted
12/27/1989Case ready to be set
12/22/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/08/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Fee paid
10/24/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
10/24/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/06/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1989Fee paid
08/30/1989Fee paid
08/25/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/25/1989Transcript Filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. J. Roberto Oaxaca
UnknownAppellantHon. Dan C. Dargene
Trial Court Information
346th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Jose Jesus Baca
88-917