judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00871-CV
01-89-00871-CV
08/25/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Hamilton, Elaine
The Southland Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/20/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/05/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
02/12/1992Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/12/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
12/09/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
11/25/1991Writ filed
10/24/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/16/1991Motion for rehearing filed
08/01/1991Court's Previous Opinion Withdrawn
08/01/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/01/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
08/01/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
03/14/1991Motion for leave to file
11/21/1990Order entered
11/12/1990Motion for leave to file
05/03/1990Motion for rehearing filed
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/14/1990Submitted
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
12/12/1989Submission
12/04/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/07/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/02/1989Notice of dismissal
08/28/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/25/1989Transcript filed
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SEElaine Hamilton
StateAppelleeRyan A. Beason
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
87-36651