judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00211-CR
12-89-00211-CR
08/25/1989
Marijuana Possession
Cortez, Jose
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/15/1991
03/13/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991
02/11/1991
01/25/1991Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/25/1991Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
01/18/1991No Description Available.
11/15/1990Disposition of MotionDismissed
11/15/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/13/1990Submitted
11/13/1990Submission
11/06/1990No Description Available.
10/15/1990Submission
11/03/1989
10/11/1989Brief Filed
10/11/1989Case ready to be set
09/21/1989Brief Filed
09/14/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/30/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
06/14/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
03/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cortez, JoseCriminal - AppellantHon. Moises V. Vela
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon. Howard Whitworth
Trial Court Information
145th District Court
Nacogdoches
3305-88-8
15 Yrs. TDC, $5,000 Fine