judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00801-CR
14-89-00801-CR
08/25/1989
All Misdemeanors
Jones, Robert Dale
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/1990Case stored
08/27/1990Mandate Issued
08/27/1990Mandate Issued
08/13/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/27/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
07/12/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/12/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/11/1990Submitted
07/11/1990Submission
07/11/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/26/1990Case ready to be set
01/02/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAMOOT
11/30/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
11/30/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STADENIED
11/30/1989No description available.
11/30/1989Transcript FILED
11/17/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
11/16/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/16/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
11/16/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
11/09/1989No description available.
10/09/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
10/06/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
08/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/22/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
06/30/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/09/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWilliam M. Walls
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 11
Harris
Honorable DAVID MENDOZA
8908956
30 dys. HCJ, $250. fine