judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00626-CR
14-89-00626-CR
07/06/1989
Other Felony
Lewis, Leroy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/1990Case stored
04/03/1990Mandate Issued
04/03/1990Mandate Issued
03/19/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/02/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/31/1990Submitted
01/31/1990Submission
01/31/1990Submitted
01/03/1990Submission
11/27/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/30/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/05/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/05/1989No description available.
09/14/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/05/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/03/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/11/1989Transcript FILED
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Date of Sentence
06/16/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. William O. Juvrud
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJohn T. Quinn
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
18,414-272
10 years TDC