judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00627-CV
14-89-00627-CV
07/06/1989
Contract
Banctexas Houston
Gorbert, Edward D. & Commonwealth Land Title Co., Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/30/1989Mandate Issued
10/30/1989Mandate Issued
09/29/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
09/14/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
09/14/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
09/14/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
09/14/1989No description available.
09/14/1989No description available.
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/13/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
09/07/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/31/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
08/31/1989Mtn.Addit.Attorney DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
08/31/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
08/30/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/29/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
08/18/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/18/1989Mtn.Additional Attorney FILED - ANT, APE
07/06/1989Transcript FILED
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/12/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJ. Steven Stewart
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. William Wirth
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeLee M. Larkin
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable DON WITTIG
85-64602