judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00180-CR
02-89-00180-CR
07/06/1989
Other Felony
Balawajder, Ex Parte Jeffrey Stephen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/06/2003Case Returned from Higher Court
12/05/1991Case stored
12/05/1991Order EnteredConsolidations or Voids
02/19/1990Case ready to be set
02/19/1990Order Entered
02/12/1990Brief Filed
01/17/1990Brief Filed
12/14/1989Order Entered
12/13/1989No Description Available.
12/13/1989Submission
10/30/1989Order EnteredAbated
09/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/21/1989Motion Filed
08/22/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/01/1989No Description Available.
07/31/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Balawajder, Ex Parte Jeffrey SCriminal - Appellant
The State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0262452D