judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00175-CR
02-89-00175-CR
07/05/1989
Other Felony
Miller, Ex Parte Walter Don
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1989Mandate Issued
10/11/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/11/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
09/28/1989Letter
09/28/1989Order Entered
09/13/1989No Description Available.
08/23/1989Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyMotion or Writ Denied
08/22/1989Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
08/14/1989Letter
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Thomas Bacus
C-1282