judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00153-CV
02-89-00153-CV
07/05/1989
Divorce
Smith, Karmen Brumbelow
Smith, Richard Allan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/03/1999Case Destroyed Per Tex. Gov't Code sect. 51.204(d)
08/29/1989Case stored
08/10/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
08/10/1989Motion DisposedItem is Moot
07/24/1989Letter
07/14/1989Motion Filed
07/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1989Letter
07/05/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
233-118564