judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0953-89
PD-0953-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
LONGORIA, MARY HELEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/28/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/1992FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
04/01/1992REHEAR DISPDENIED
04/01/1992REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/03/1989REHEAR FILED PDR
10/03/1989REHEAR FILED
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/28/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1992STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateGeorge Filley III
LONGORIA, MARY HELENApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Juan Martinez Gonzales
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00163-CR
Aff 5-25-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Whayland G. Kilgore
82-11-10,885