judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0952-89
PD-0952-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
LEWIS, GLENN C.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LEWIS, GLENN C.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Nathaniel G. Rhodes
STATE OF TEXASStateCarlos Valdez
Court of Appeals Information:
13-87-00245-CR
Aff 5-18-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 4
Nueces
Honorable James E. Klager
100405-4