judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0955-89
PD-0955-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
HOWELL, JAMES NORRIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/22/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
11/22/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/26/1989REHEAR FILED
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/23/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HOWELL, JAMES NORRISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gerald E. Bourque
STATE OF TEXASStateW. C. Kirkendall
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00119-CR
Aff 4-20-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Gonzales
Honorable B. B. Schraub
106-87