judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0961-89
PD-0961-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
PENNEY, JAMES M.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Penney, James M.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Juan Martinez Gonzales
STATE OF TEXASStateSam Oatman
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00047-CR
Aff 5-31-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
Llano
Honorable Clayton E. Evans
4109