judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0941-89
PD-0941-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
GARIBALDI, JESSE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/07/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/07/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garibaldi, JesseApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jeffrey M. Gamso
Sam Ogan
STATE OF TEXASStateRandall Sherrod
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00201-CR
Aff 5-17-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
181st District Court
Randall
Honorable Marvin Marshall
6075-B