judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0962-89
PD-0962-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
DOMINGUEZ, DOMINGO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/28/1990FINAL DISPRefused
09/12/1990PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/04/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
DOMINGUEZ, DOMINGOApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Louis T. Rosenberg
Court of Appeals Information:
03-87-00287-CR
Aff 3-1-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable JON N. WISSER
85,777