judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00221-CV
08-89-00221-CV
07/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Whitaker, Robert & Georgia Kubiak
Huffaker, Calloway et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/2011Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
01/14/1991Shuck purged
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
12/05/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
12/05/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
09/06/1990Fee paid
09/04/1990Fee paid
08/24/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/14/1990Application for Writ of Error
08/14/1990Fee paid
08/01/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
07/12/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/06/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
06/19/1990Fee paid
06/06/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/25/1990Fee paid
05/24/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/09/1990Payment of fee due requested
05/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1990Fee paid
11/09/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/09/1989Submission
11/09/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission
09/28/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Brief Filed
09/05/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
08/30/1989Motion to supplement filed
08/09/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
07/27/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
07/24/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/06/1989Deposition Filed
07/06/1989Exhibits Filed
07/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/06/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/06/1989Transcript Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Joe K. McGill
UnknownAppelleeHon. James H. Milam
UnknownAppellantHon. Richard D Davis
UnknownAppelleeHon. John A. Flygare
UnknownAppelleeHon. J.T. Kelley
Trial Court Information
106th District Court
Gaines
Honorable GEORGE HANSARD
11,017