judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEMETRIC PEARSON V. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT

Case Information: 10-CV-1314
Short Caption:DEMETRIC PEARSON V. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENTClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4598-10Filed Date:10/20/2010

Opening Event Date:10/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/28/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDemetric PearsonYPro SeN
AppelleeEdgewood ManagementN
Robert P. LynchNY
Matthew H. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 20, 2010, and it appea ring that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
11/04/2010RECEIVED - Aplt's brief
11/04/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
11/05/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for appeal transript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 9/24/10, 9/27/10 & 10/19/10) (elp)
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (15-pgs/tape 9/24/10 proc)w/cd
12/28/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010RECORD INDEX
12/28/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, and the lodged brief of appellant and the limited appendix, it si ORDERED that the lodged brief of appellant and the limited appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/12/2011APPENDIX - (LIMITED) *ATTACHED TO APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/16/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 12, 2011, directing appellee to file the brief within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief_ or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject the appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
03/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 16, 2011, which directed appellee to submit its brief within 15 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the brief has not yet been filed, it is ORDEREd that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) elp
03/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/14/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED of aplt
03/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL no oppo (settled, and settlement agreement attached)
03/24/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/24/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion to dismiss appeal, to which no opposition has been filed,and it appearing that the parties have reached a settlement agreement, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion to dismiss is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (b). (ETW) elp
03/24/2011DISMISSED
04/14/2011MANDATE ISSUED