judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0942-89
PD-0942-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
JACKSON, WILLIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/31/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/31/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JACKSON, WILLIEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gary Taylor
STATE OF TEXASStateTravis S. Ware
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00247-CR
Aff 5-17-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William R. Shaver
87-405,795