judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-00044-CR
06-89-00044-CR
07/06/1989
Burglary
Wilson, William Leon
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/1990Mandate issued
12/19/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1989Submitted
09/12/1989Submission
09/07/1989Brief Filed
08/14/1989Brief Filed
07/24/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/10/1989Transcript Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
124th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Alvin G. Khoury
17,011-B
75 years TDC