judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00231-CV
07-89-00231-CV
07/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Cox, Vera Mae, Wilma Jean Gilmore, et al.
Stowers, Vernon T. dba Stowers Oil & Gas Co., et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1990Mandate Issued
03/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/05/1990Submitted
03/05/1990Submission
02/16/1990Submission
08/25/1989Case ready to be set
08/25/1989Brief Filed
08/07/1989Brief Filed
07/27/1989Do not use
07/27/1989Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGranted in part/Overruled in part
07/11/1989Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
07/06/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
223rd District Court
Gray
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
25,731