judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00796-CR
05-89-00796-CR
07/06/1989
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Lintz, Jr., Willard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/1993Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/30/1992Motion to Withdraw Record
04/15/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Denied
03/06/1991Mandate Issued
03/06/1991Mandate Issued
01/10/1991Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
10/01/1990Brief Filed
09/11/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1990Response to Motion
09/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
09/04/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
08/20/1990MattConv
04/23/1990Brief Filed
04/23/1990Case ready to be set
04/23/1990Case ready to be set
03/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/26/1990Brief Filed
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe Kendall
F88-98728-LN
55 yrs TDC & $5,000 Fine