judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00793-CR
05-89-00793-CR
07/06/1989
Escape
James Roy
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2001Record RetentionRetain
08/24/2000Return to storage
11/25/1991Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/07/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/27/1991Motion to file supplemental brief filed
06/20/1991Reply to response or motion filed
06/20/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/29/1991Response to Motion
05/22/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/15/1991Opinion Withdrawn
05/15/1991Substitute OpinionReversed and Remanded
05/15/1991Substitute OpinionReversed and Remanded
05/15/1991Substitute OpinionReversed and Remanded
04/30/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
04/19/1991Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
03/18/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/04/1991Response to Motion
02/21/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/03/1990Motion to Show Authorities
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
04/13/1990Brief Filed
04/13/1990Case ready to be set
04/13/1990Case ready to be set
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/26/1990Motion to Show Authorities
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/19/1990Brief Filed
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/15/1989Transcript Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roy, JamesCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F88-92169-RN
27 yrs TDC