judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY v. DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI

Case Heading (S-08-0149)
Case Number:S-08-0149Case Docketed On:07/11/2008
Linked To: S-08-0148
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY v. DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI
Full Title:BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBlair NewmanMichael E. Warren
AppelleeDean GrommetPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters
AppelleeMalinda GrommetPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters
AppelleeMichelle CostiPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts
Opinion Number:2009 WY 150
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
07/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/11/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/23/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
08/20/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/08/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Murphy requesting that oral argument be held until December.EventPhone CallFinal
10/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received - appellees' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, trial transcript; Volume V, exhibits; Volume VI, depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/26/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant. Called counsel's office re no original signature on brief. Will send replacementEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Brief - Other - received page 19 with original signatureBriefOtherFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Grommet, et al.; and Micahel Warren for Newman.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas S. Peters for appellants Grommet, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/30/2008Order - Denying Motion to Take Judicial NoticeOrderDenyFinal
01/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Counsel's Correction of Mis-Statement at Oral ArgumentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in S-08-0148 and reversing and remanding in S-08-0149, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal