judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: XAVIER J. VEGA

Case Information: 10-BG-1305
Short Caption:IN RE: XAVIER J. VEGAClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN203-10Filed Date:10/25/2010

Opening Event Date:10/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Joseph Charles PerryNY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentXavier J. Vega NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/25/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of California suspending respondent from the practice of law for one year stayed upon completion of a two-year probationary period.
11/10/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of California suspending respondent from the practice of law for one year, staying this suspension and placing respondent on probation for two years, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law for one year, all stayed during a two-year probationary period subject to the same terms as those imposed in California. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
12/03/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondent does not oppose identical reciprocal discipline.
12/15/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
12/28/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
01/13/2011SUSPENSION ORDERED that Xavier J. Vega, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of one year; however, that suspension is hereby stayed pending respondent's successful completion of the probationary period imposed by California. (BR,TE,FA)