judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00154-CV
02-89-00154-CV
07/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
DLD, Inc. d/b/a Fort Worth Auto Auction
Guaranty Bank & Trust Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/25/1991Mandate Issued
02/06/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/31/1991Response Filed
01/21/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/07/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
12/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/19/1990Letter Brief Filed
01/10/1990Submitted
01/10/1990Submission
01/09/1990Brief Received, Not Filed
01/08/1990Letter Brief Filed
12/22/1989Brief Filed
11/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/30/1989Brief Filed
09/14/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/22/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/31/1989Submission
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dld, Inc. D/b/aAppellant
Guaranty Bank & Trust Co.Appellee
Fort Worth Auto Auction(d/b/a)Appellant
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Harry Hopkins
352-107720-