judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0957-89
PD-0957-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
PARLIN, RICHARD J., JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateKen Anderson
PARLIN, RICHARD J.JR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Ian Inglis
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00078-CR
Aff 5-17-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
26th District Court
Williamson
Honorable William S. Lott
87-554-K