judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0958-89
PD-0958-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
CARRAO, JAMES VINCENT AKA CARR, JIM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/15/1990BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
12/15/1989BRIEF FILEDPro Se
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/14/1990MANDATE ISSD
12/07/1990WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
11/13/1990STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
11/13/1990STAY MANDAT MOT TOFiled
09/26/1990STAY MANDAT MOT TOFiled
09/26/1990STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
09/12/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
07/12/1990REHEAR FILED
06/07/1990REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
06/06/1990REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
05/30/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
05/30/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
04/25/1990SUBMITTED
03/14/1990SUPP TR FILED
02/16/1990MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTDENIED
02/16/1990MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTFiled
02/09/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
01/15/1990BRIEF FILED
12/15/1989BRIEF FILED
11/10/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
11/10/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
10/30/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
10/30/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
10/30/1989MOTIONDENIED
10/30/1989MOTION FILED
10/04/1989PDR DISPGranted
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBill M. Reimer
Robert A. Huttash
CARRAO, JAMES VINCENT AKA CARRApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James Vincent Carrao
Court of Appeals Information:
03-87-00097-CR
Aff 2-22-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
207th District Court
Comal
Honorable ROBERT T. PFEUFFER
CR-86-74B