judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0948-89
PD-0948-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
KAISNER, RANDY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/22/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
11/22/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/19/1989REHEAR FILED
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBruce Isaacks
Tom Maness
KAISNER, RANDYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bruce Anton
Frank Jackson
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00212-CR
Aff 5-24-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable W. C. Boyd
50588