judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0947-89
PD-0947-89
07/06/1989
PDR Case Type
ROSE, KEVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROSE, KEVINApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Paul Williams
STATE OF TEXASStateJames L. Rex
Court of Appeals Information:
08-88-00077-CR
Rev & Aquitted 4-26-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
109th District Court
Andrews
Honorable James H. Clack
2021