judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8823
C-8823
07/06/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
RIVER OAKS TRUST COMPANY ET AL.
THE HONORABLE THOMAS J. STOVALL JUDGE ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/12/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentREAL PARTIES ROBERT A. HIGHLEY
09/15/1989Reply BriefRelatorOPPOSING STATEMENT CONCERNING INFOR- MAL REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFICATION OR RECUSAL OF JUSTICE COOK
07/07/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
07/07/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF/ROBERT A. HIGLEY
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/16/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
10/25/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedmotion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sitJ.COOK NOT SITTING.
10/25/1989MET to file reply disposed ofdismissed as mootPARTY IN INTEREST, KATHLEEN EBERT'S, M/E/T TO FILE REPLY TO MANDAMUS IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. (J.COOK NOT SITTING).
10/25/1989Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.dismissed as mootREL.M/L/F MO/STRIKE HIGLEY REPLY TO MANDAMUS IS DISMISSED AS MOOT (J. COOK NOT SITTING).
10/25/1989Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.ORDER OF 7/7/89 GRANTING M/L/F IS WITHDRAWN AS BEING IMPROVIDENTLY GRANTED (J. COOK NOT SITTING)
10/25/1989Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screenSTAY ORD.ISSUED 7/7/89 TO PROBATE CT #1 OF HARRIS CO. IN CASES 94,467 & 225,652 IS VACATED & SET ASIDE(J.COOK N/S)
10/18/1989Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY JACK W. LAWTER, FOR RESP BY JOHN M. O'QUINN, BRAD WRIGHT & WILLIAM W. KILGARLIN
10/17/1989Affidavit filedOF JACK W. LAWTER, JR.
10/17/1989Affidavit filedOF JOSEPH S. HORRIGAN
10/17/1989Affidavit filedOF LINDA L. KELLY
10/17/1989Miscellaneous MotionM/L/F/ MOTION TO STRIKE HIGLEY'S REPLY TO MANDAMUS.
10/17/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedREAL PARTY, KATHLEEN EBERT
10/16/1989Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMO FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL TO ARGUE
10/12/1989Relator's reply brief
10/12/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusREAL PARTIES ROBERT A. HIGHLEY
10/11/1989Miscellaneous MotionM/L/F FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL TO ARGUE
10/06/1989Notice of change of counselLETTER FROM WM. W. KILGARLIN REQUESTING THAT HE BE LISTED AS COUNSEL FOR ROBERT A. HIGLEY, REAL PARTY
09/21/1989Letter ReceivedLETTER REQUESTING THAT J.COOK RECUSE HIMSELF. MARSHALL D.BROWN (REPR/PAOLO DE PORTANOVA, 3000 POST OAK, HOUSTON
09/15/1989Reply BriefOPPOSING STATEMENT CONCERNING INFOR- MAL REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFICATION OR RECUSAL OF JUSTICE COOK
09/07/1989Letter FiledREPLY TO A LETTER ADDRESSED TO JUDGE COOK
07/07/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.RELS (25/10 MIN REBUT) RSPS (25 MIN)
07/07/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
07/07/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedFiling grantedSTAY ORDER ISSUED(W/D AS IMPROVIDENT ON 10/25/89.
07/07/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedFiling grantedSTAY ORDER ISSUED (SEE NEXT EVT)
07/07/1989No description available.
07/07/1989Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
07/07/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF/ROBERT A. HIGLEY
07/07/1989Set for Submission
07/07/1989Stay Order issuedTO PROBATE CT.#1, HARRIS CO., IN CAUSES NO. 94,467 AND 94,467-405 UNTIL SUPREME COURT ACTS ON PETITION.
07/06/1989Exhibits received
07/06/1989Motion for temporary relief
07/06/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/06/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/16/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PENSOTTI, ROBERTORelatorMr. Jack W. Lawter Jr.
PORTANOVA, UGO DIRelatorMr. Joseph S. Horrigan
LAMATTA, UMBERTORelatorMr. Jack W. Lawter Jr.
HUTCHISON, III, JOHN A.RespondentMr. Anthony F. Loria
HIGLEY, ROBERT A.RespondentMr. John M. O'Quinn
HORRIGAN, JOSEPH S.RelatorMr. Joseph S. Horrigan
CULLEN FOUNDATIONRespondentMr. C. Boone Schwartzel
NEALE, JOHNRelatorMr. Jack W. Lawter Jr.
JOHNSON, GlennRelatorMr. Jack W. Lawter Jr.
EBERT, KATHLEENRespondentMs. Kathleen Ebert
Court of Appeals Information:
01-89-00646-CV
Overruled
Rule 90, 06-27-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Harris
226,652