judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00628-CV
14-89-00628-CV
07/06/1989
Divorce
Smith, Sarah Louise
Abramson, A. D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/04/1990Case stored
11/27/1990Mandate Issued
11/27/1990Mandate Issued
11/12/1990Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
05/08/1990Writ of Error FILED
05/03/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/03/1990Writ of Error FILED
04/19/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/19/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
04/16/1990Writ of Error RECEIVED
04/11/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
04/09/1990Amended motion for rehearing FILED - ANT,APE
04/06/1990Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE
04/05/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
03/30/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
03/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/17/1990Submitted
01/17/1990Submission
01/17/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Mtn.to reschedule oral argu.DISPOSED - ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
01/16/1990Mtn.to reschedule oral argu.FILED - ANT,APE,STA
01/11/1990Reply Brief Filed
12/19/1989Submission
11/09/1989Amended brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP,STA,
11/09/1989Mtn.Lv.file amend.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/24/1989Amended brief RECEIVED - ANT,APE,APP,STA
10/24/1989Mtn.Lv.FILE amended brief - ANT,APE,APP
09/29/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
09/15/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
08/31/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/16/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/04/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/27/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
07/27/1989No description available.
07/18/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
07/14/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
07/06/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1989Motion for new trial FILED
03/08/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantRobert E. Newey
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeBen Taylor
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRoger Townsend
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Mary M. Rawlins
Trial Court Information
257th District Court
Harris
Honorable NORMAN R. LEE
87-28587