judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2205
A-2205
04/25/1949
Application for Writ of Error
DREW CRAIN
WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/1949Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
06/01/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/02/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/30/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/25/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/13/1949Amended motion for rehearing
06/01/1949Motion for Rehearing
05/02/1949Reply to Response
05/02/1949Miscellaneous Motion
04/30/1949Response to Petition
04/25/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/25/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Drew CrainPetitioner
WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information