judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2199
A-2199
04/22/1949
MISC PETITION
GRIEVANCE COMMITTEE OF STATE BAR OF TEXAS FOR 20TH CONGRESSIONAL DISTRICT SAN ANTONIO BAR ASSOCIATION, ET AL.
STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/29/1949Motion for RehearingRelator
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/30/1949Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRelator
05/21/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/22/1949Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/29/1949Motion for Rehearing
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/30/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/30/1949Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
05/21/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1949Miscellaneous Motion
05/16/1949Letter Filed
05/04/1949Miscellaneous Motion
05/02/1949Motion for leave to file brief
05/02/1949Miscellaneous Motion
04/28/1949Miscellaneous Motion
04/22/1949Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/22/1949motion for leave to file petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Albert J. De LangeAmicus Curiae
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and BatesAmicus Curiae
Burges, Scott, Rasberry and Hurst, et al.Amicus Curiae
Committee on Unauthorized Pratice of Law of Dallas Bar AssociationAmicus Curiae
Unauthorized Practice Committee of Fort Worth Bar AssociationAmicus Curiae
Keys and HoltAmicus Curiae
Bar Association of Johnson County, TexasAmicus Curiae
Grievance Committee of State Bar of Texas for 20th Congressional District San Antonio Bar Association, et al.Relator
Board of Directors and Unauthorized Pratice Committee of State Bar of TexasAmicus Curiae
Unauthorized Practice Committee of Houston Bar AssociationAmicus Curiae
Stewart Title Guaranty Company, et al.Respondent
Kelley, Looney, McLean and Enochs, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information