judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LITTLE (LINDA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36339
Short Caption:LITTLE (LINDA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 966Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/23/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/23/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10768
06/23/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: May 31, 2000. 00-10769
07/10/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: on or before July 17, 2000. 00-11732
07/18/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-12429
07/18/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. 00-12431
07/19/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The fifteen-page fast track statement and the appendix provisionally submitted on July 18, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-12444
07/19/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-12433
07/19/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 through. 00-12434
08/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-13663
09/22/2000Order/Procedural Order. On May 31, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a rough draft transcript request with the district court. To date the transcript has not been filed. Court Reporter Gloria Jean Smith shall file the sentencing transcript within 10 days of this order or show cause why Smith should not be sanctioned. 00-16748
09/27/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 00-17086
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . the judgment of the district court is affirmed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17382
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17461
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17461