judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RJ PRODUCTION COMPANY V. NESTLE, USA, INC.,ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1362
Short Caption:RJ PRODUCTION COMPANY V. NESTLE, USA, INC.,ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1773-10Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantR J Production Company D/b/a DigimediaNPro SeN
AppelleeNestle Usa IncN
Robert B. WallaceNY
AppelleeXlntads LLCN
Robert B. WallaceNY
AppelleeLiza James N
Robert B. WallaceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (Titled as: Appellee's Motion to Strike - notice of appeal . . . ) LW (dwm)
11/19/2010TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss - 12/9/10 order holding MEDIS in abeyance & directing appellant to ID counsel - R Johnson's motion to proceed as himself - R Johnson's motion to reconsider 12/9/10 order - oppo - R Johnson's motion to file (LODGED) reply
11/22/2010RECEIVED - Aplt's motion for extension of time to find an attorney (sent back, no cert. of service on pleading)
12/01/2010APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS & TO OBTAIN COUNSEL (Titled as: Motion for Extension of Time to find attorney)dwm LW
12/06/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for extension of time to find an attorney
12/09/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME to file a response and to ID COUNSEL IS GRANTED to the extent that counsel for appellant shall be identified NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 21, 2010. Failure to ID COUNSEL shall result in dismissal of this appeal...It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (BY: ETW) lw
12/17/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to proceed as Raymond Johnson in lieu of RJ Production Company D/B/A Digimedia AND LODGED Reply to aple's opposition to aplt's motion for extension of time to find an attorney LW
12/20/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for reconsideration of court's order requiring aplt to appear through cousel and motion to proceed pro se (Construed as a supplement to motion filed on December 17, 2010)
12/29/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Appellant's Motion to Proceed as Raymond Johnson pro se and the supplement of motion (titled as: Motion for Reconsideration . . . )
01/14/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply to Appellee's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Orderrequiring RJ Production Co. . . . to appear through counsel and to appear pro se (requires a MOLV to file out of time - returned by mail to appellant)
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY to Appellee's (in) Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration (with attached hand-written MOLV)
01/19/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply to Appellee's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Orderrequiring RJ Production Co. . . . to appear through counsel and to appear pro se
01/25/2011 ORDERED that RAYMOND JOHNSON'S MOTIONS TO PROCEED AS HIMSELF and TO RECONSIDER the 12/9/10 order ARE DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
01/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and the appeal is here DISMISSED as appellant has failed to identify counsel...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
01/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that RAYMOND JOHNSON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE to file the lodged reply IS DENIED AS MOOT and because this court only reviews evidence presented before the trial court. (BRTEFA) (cb)
01/25/2011DISMISSED
02/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED