judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2193
A-2193
04/14/1949
Application for Writ of Error
MISS KATE BELL, ET AL., M. G. AVEN
J. D. BROWN, JR., BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF PYTHIAN WIDOWS AND ORPHANS HOME, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/27/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
04/14/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1949Response to Petition
04/27/1949Response to Petition
04/22/1949Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
04/19/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/14/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. G. AvenPetitioner
Board of Directors of Pythian Widows and Orphans Home, et al.Respondent
Miss Kate Bell, et al.Petitioner
J. D. Brown, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information