judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1232-89
PD-1232-89
09/06/1989
PDR Case Type
HOLLAND, KENNETH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/13/1990BRIEF FILEDState
02/14/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONDENIED
03/07/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
02/15/1991MANDATE ISSD
01/30/1991OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
10/17/1990SUBMITTED
08/09/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
04/13/1990BRIEF FILED
03/19/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
03/19/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
03/19/1990NO BRIEF FILED
02/14/1990BRIEF FILED
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/20/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/20/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/09/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateKen Anderson
HOLLAND, KENNETHApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Phil Campbell
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00037-CR
Aff 4-12-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
277th District Court
Williamson
Honorable JOHN R. CARTER
87-586-K