judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9030
C-9030
09/06/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
NATIONAL STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL.
HERMANN HOSPITAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/09/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL AND OTHERS BY LISA A. MANZIEL, 9319 LBJ FREEWAY, STE 110, DALLAS, TX 75243
11/03/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/03/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/12/1990Record returned to Court of Appeals
02/07/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling granted
02/07/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledM/E/T MO/RE GRANTED
01/18/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
01/09/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
01/09/1990Motion for Rehearing
12/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
11/22/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL AND OTHERS BY LISA A. MANZIEL, 9319 LBJ FREEWAY, STE 110, DALLAS, TX 75243
11/08/1989Case forwarded to Court
11/08/1989No description available.
11/03/1989Reply to Response
10/12/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling granted
10/03/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/07/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
09/06/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00854-CV
Reversed and Remanded
776 SW2d 249, 07-20-89
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable James F. Warren
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
79-18882-A